Refine your search

13 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/24/1992 Became Public Law No: 102-511.
10/24/1992 Signed by President.
10/16/1992 Presented to President.
10/03/1992 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 164 (Roll no. 462).
10/01/1992 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
10/01/1992 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 102-964 filed.
09/24/1992 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
09/16/1992 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate disagreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
08/11/1992 To conference: On motion that the House insist upon its amendments, and request a conference Agreed to by voice vote.
08/06/1992 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/02/1992 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 76-20. Record Vote No: 148.
06/02/1992 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell with an amendment. With written report No. 102-292. Additional views filed.
04/07/1992 Introduced in Senate