There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations for the Interagency Council on the Homeless, the Federal Emergency Management Food and Shelter Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/31/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
07/22/1992Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Glenn without amendment. With written report No. 102-327.
04/28/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
08/04/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
08/03/1992-5:39pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/03/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/1992-4:50pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/31/1992SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
07/22/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 551.
07/22/1992SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Glenn without amendment. With written report No. 102-327.
06/25/1992SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/14/1992SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-676.
04/28/1992SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 04/28/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/29/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/29/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/29/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/30/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/30/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 05/05/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/05/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 05/06/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/07/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/12/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/13/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/13/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/13/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/14/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/14/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/19/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/19/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/20/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/20/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/20/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/21/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/02/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/02/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/02/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/03/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/09/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/09/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/10/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/11/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/15/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/15/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/17/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/18/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/23/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 06/23/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/30/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/02/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/20/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs04/28/1992 Referred to
05/14/1992 Hearings by
06/25/1992 Markup by
07/22/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-327
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs08/04/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2624.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2624. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/28/1992)

Title I: Interagency Council on the Homeless - Amends the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act to extend the authorization of appropriations for the Interagency Council on the Homeless, and the Council's authority, through October 1, 1994.

Title II: Federal Emergency Management Food and Shelter Program - Amends the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act to extend the authorization of appropriations for the Federal emergency management food and shelter program.