Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 04/28/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/28/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/29/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/29/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/29/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/30/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/30/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 05/05/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/05/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 05/06/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/07/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/12/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/13/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/13/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/13/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/14/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/14/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/19/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/19/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/20/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/20/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/20/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/21/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/02/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/02/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/02/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/03/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/09/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/09/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/10/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 06/11/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/15/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/15/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/17/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/18/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/23/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 06/23/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/30/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/02/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/20/1992