Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/09/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/09/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/09/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/09/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/09/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/09/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/09/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/09/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/17/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/17/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/17/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/17/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/23/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/23/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/21/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/21/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/21/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/21/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/21/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/21/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/30/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/14/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 09/14/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/14/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 09/17/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/18/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/18/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/18/1992
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/18/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/18/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/18/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/18/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/18/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/18/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/18/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/18/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/18/1992
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/23/1992