There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Energy National Laboratory International Energy and Environmental Technology Development Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a program, to be known as the "ADEPT" Program, for the provision of international assistance in the deployment of energy and energy-related environmental practices and technologies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/18/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
07/09/1992Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Agency for International Development, and Office of Management and Budget.
07/07/1992Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Environmental Protection Agency, Departments of Commerce, Energy, and State, U.S. Trade Representative, and Office of Management and Budget.
06/18/1992Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/23/1992
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/24/1992 07/24/1992 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/18/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2866.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2866. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/18/1992)

Department of Energy National Laboratory International Energy and Environmental Technology Development Act - Directs the Secretary of Energy (the Secretary) to: (1) establish the Assisting Deployment of Energy and Environmental Practices and Technologies Program (ADEPT) for the development and deployment of energy and environmental practices and technologies; (2) promote, in cooperation with the private sector, international technology cooperation through the participation of the multiprogram national laboratories of the Department of Energy (DOE); and (3) establish within DOE the ADEPT Management Panel to oversee implementation of the ADEPT Program according to prescribed guidelines.

Provides that the Program shall be managed by the Secretary independently of other foreign assistance programs of the Federal Government but that it may have cooperative activities and cost-sharing arrangements with certain other Federal agencies. Prescribes guidelines for the establishment of an information clearinghouse under the Program to disseminate energy and environmental technology alternatives.

Establishes the Interagency Working Group to assist and advise the Secretary about the priority of projects to be funded under the ADEPT Program and the integration of pertinent information. Requires the Secretary to take into consideration the advice of the ADEPT Management Panel and the Interagency Working Group when making any decision to approve or disapprove an ADEPT Program project proposal.

Directs the ADEPT Management Panel, in consultation with the Interagency Working Group, to submit periodically for the Secretary's review and approval a consolidated plan for the ADEPT Program. Directs the Secretary to submit a copy of such plan to the Congress.

Prohibits ADEPT Program implementation from affecting the activities and funding of certain DOE cooperative projects. Authorizes appropriations.