Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/25/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/29/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/29/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/29/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/30/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/30/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/30/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/30/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/30/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/30/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/30/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 06/30/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/30/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/30/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/01/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/01/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/01/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/02/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/02/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/02/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/21/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/21/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/21/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/31/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/10/1992