Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 06/18/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/23/1992
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/26/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/02/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/20/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/20/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/23/1992