Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/24/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 06/24/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/26/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/29/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/20/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/20/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 07/21/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/22/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/28/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/31/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/03/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 08/04/1992