Committees: S.292 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/30/1991 Referred to
04/18/1991 Markup by
04/23/1991 Reported by S.Rept 102-44
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests01/31/1991 Referred to
03/21/1991 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs04/29/1991 Referred to
05/22/1991 Markup by
06/03/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-88
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands05/07/1991 Referred to
05/07/1991 Hearings by
05/14/1991 Markup by
05/14/1991 Reported by