Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 07/02/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/27/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/27/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/04/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 08/06/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 08/11/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 08/12/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/09/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 09/22/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 09/22/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/24/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/29/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/05/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/07/1992