Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/24/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/28/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 07/29/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/29/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/29/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 08/03/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 08/04/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 08/05/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 08/07/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 08/07/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 08/07/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/11/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/08/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/18/1992