Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/31/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/31/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/31/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 01/31/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/05/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/05/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/06/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/06/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/06/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/07/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/21/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/22/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/22/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/22/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/22/1991