Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 02/05/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/05/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/05/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/05/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/05/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/05/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 02/05/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 02/05/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/19/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/23/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/14/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 11/26/1991