Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/22/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/22/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/14/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/26/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/09/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/17/1991