Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/22/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/22/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/22/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/14/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/20/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/09/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/24/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 04/25/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 05/08/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 05/15/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/03/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/03/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/19/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/19/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/20/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/24/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/25/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/26/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/27/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/27/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 07/08/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/10/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/15/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 07/23/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/24/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/24/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/26/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/30/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/11/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/11/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 09/11/1991
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 09/17/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/17/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/24/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/24/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/01/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/03/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 10/29/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/01/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 11/01/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 11/01/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/01/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 11/01/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 11/01/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/01/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/05/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/06/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 11/07/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/07/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/07/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/13/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 11/15/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/19/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/20/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 11/21/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 11/26/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/27/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/21/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/18/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/12/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew