There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Popular Titles

Animal Research Facilities Act bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Animal Enterprise Protection Act of 1992

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Animal Enterprise Protection Act of 1992

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Animal Research Facilities Protection Act of 1991

Short Titles as Introduced

Animal Research Facilities Protection Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Food, Agriculture, Conservation and Trade Act of 1990 to provide protection to animal research facilities from illegal acts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/26/1992Became Public Law No: 102-346.
08/26/1992Signed by President.
08/14/1992Presented to President.
08/07/1992Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
08/04/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
08/04/1992Committee on Agriculture discharged.
10/16/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/16/1991Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/05/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/26/1992Became Public Law No: 102-346.
08/26/1992Signed by President.
08/14/1992SenatePresented to President.
08/10/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/07/1992SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
08/06/1992SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
08/04/1992-7:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/04/1992-7:25pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 2407 was laid on the table without objection.
08/04/1992-7:25pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended to that of similar measure H.R. 2407. Agreed to without objection.
08/04/1992-7:25pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
08/04/1992-7:25pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 2407. Agreed to without objection.
08/04/1992-7:24pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
08/04/1992-7:24pmHouseMr. de la Garza asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
08/04/1992HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
10/21/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/21/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/17/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
10/17/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/17/1991-10:30amHouseReceived in the House.
10/16/1991SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/16/1991SenateS.Amdt.1262 Amendment SP 1262 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/16/1991SenateS.Amdt.1262 Proposed by Senator Boren for Senator Heflin. In the nature of a substitute.
10/16/1991SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/16/1991SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/05/1991SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Agricultural Research, Gen. Leg.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry
03/05/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.

Cosponsors (33)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry03/05/1991 Referred to
10/16/1991 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry Subcommittee on Agricultural Research and General Legislation04/05/1991 Referred to
House Agriculture10/17/1991 Referred to
08/04/1992 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy and Poultry10/21/1991 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture10/21/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.544. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/04/1992)

Animal Enterprise Protection Act of 1992 - Amends Federal criminal law to provide a fine or up to one year in prison, or both, for anyone who: (1) travels in interstate or foreign commerce or uses the mail or any facility in such commerce; and (2) intentionally physically disrupts the functioning of an animal enterprise by intentionally stealing, damaging, or causing the loss of enterprise property, including animals and records (or conspiring to do so), and thereby causes it more than $10,000 of economic damage.

Increases the imprisonment penalty to: (1) not more than ten years if such offense causes serious bodily injury to an individual; and (2) life if such offense results in the death of an individual.

Provides that a related order of restitution may include restitution for: (1) lost projects from food production or farm income; and (2) repeat experimentation costs.

Defines "animal enterprise" as: (1) a commercial or academic enterprise that uses animals for food or fiber production, agriculture, research, or testing; (2) a zoo, aquarium, circus, rodeo, or lawful competitive animal event; or (3) a fair or similar event intended to advance agricultural arts and sciences.

Excludes from the meaning of "physical disruption" any disruption that results from lawful public, governmental, or animal facility employee reaction to the disclosure of facility information.

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture and the Attorney General to jointly: (1) study the extent and effect of domestic and international terrorism on facilities using animals for food or fiber production, agriculture, research, or testing; and (2) report to the Congress within one year after enactment of this Act.