Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/07/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 03/07/1991
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 03/12/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/12/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/21/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/18/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/23/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/23/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/14/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/24/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/24/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 05/24/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/03/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/03/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/06/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/11/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/18/1991
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/26/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/15/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/15/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 07/17/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/29/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/02/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/11/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/12/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/13/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 09/17/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/25/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/01/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 10/02/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/22/1991