Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/13/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/13/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/13/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/25/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/16/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/21/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 06/21/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/24/1991
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 08/02/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/13/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/31/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/31/1992