Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/14/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/20/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/06/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/14/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/08/1991