Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 04/18/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/06/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 06/24/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/28/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/30/1992