Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 04/18/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/23/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/24/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/06/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 05/07/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/08/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/15/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 05/16/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/03/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/03/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/12/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/20/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 06/25/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/27/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/27/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/10/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/10/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/15/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/16/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/22/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/25/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 07/25/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/26/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/29/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 08/01/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 08/01/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 08/01/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/26/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/15/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 11/05/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/21/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/22/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew