Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/03/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/03/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/03/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/04/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/11/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 06/18/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/18/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/18/1991
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/18/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/20/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/26/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/08/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 08/01/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 08/01/1991
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 09/12/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/16/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/01/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/01/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/19/1991