There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution concerning the 25th anniversary of the reunification of Jerusalem.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
06/18/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
06/18/1992Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
06/10/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.
06/10/1992Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/06/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/18/1992SenateMessage on House action received in Senate.
06/18/1992-1:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/18/1992-1:02pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
06/18/1992-12:58pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
06/18/1992-12:58pmHouseMr. Hamilton asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
06/18/1992HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
06/11/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/11/1992-6:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/11/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/10/1992SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.
06/10/1992SenateS.Amdt.2042 Amendment SP 2042 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
06/10/1992SenateS.Amdt.2042 Proposed by Senator Metzenbaum for Senator Moynihan. To amend the preamble.
06/10/1992SenateS.Amdt.2041 Amendment SP 2041 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
06/10/1992SenateS.Amdt.2041 Proposed by Senator Metzenbaum for Senator Moynihan. Concerning the 25th Anniversary of the reunification of Jerusalem.
06/10/1992SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/10/1992SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/06/1992SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/06/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/19/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/19/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/19/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/19/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/19/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/19/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/20/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/20/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/20/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/20/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/21/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/21/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/02/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/03/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/03/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/03/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/03/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/03/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/03/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/03/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/03/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/03/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/03/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/03/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/03/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/03/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/04/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/04/1992
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/04/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/04/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/04/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/04/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/09/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/09/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/09/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/09/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/09/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/09/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/09/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/09/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/09/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/09/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/09/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/09/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/09/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/10/1992
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/10/1992
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/10/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/10/1992
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/10/1992
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/10/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/10/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/11/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/11/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/11/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/11/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/23/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/02/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/06/1992 Referred to
06/10/1992 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs06/11/1992 Referred to
06/18/1992 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.113. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/10/1992)

Congratulates the residents of Jerusalem and the people of Israel on the 25th anniversary of the reunification of that city.

Urges that: (1) Jerusalem remain an undivided city in which the religious rights of every ethnic and religious group are protected; and (2) the President and Secretary of State issue an unequivocal statement in support of such principle.