Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 07/02/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/02/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/02/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/02/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 07/02/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 07/02/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/02/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/02/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/22/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/22/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/22/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/22/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 08/11/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 08/11/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 08/11/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 09/10/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/10/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/18/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/23/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/24/1992