There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution to commend the people of the Philippines for successfully conducting peaceful general elections and to congratulate Fidel Ramos for his election to the Presidency of the Philippines.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/02/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
08/12/1992Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
08/06/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
10/03/1992-4:29pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/03/1992-11:57amHouseReceived in the House.
10/02/1992SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
08/12/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 627.
08/12/1992SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
08/12/1992SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/06/1992SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/10/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/11/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations08/06/1992 Referred to
08/12/1992 Markup by
08/12/1992 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.134. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/06/1992)

Congratulates Fidel Ramos on his election to the Presidency of the Philippines.

Commends the people of the Philippines for institutionalizing democratic government in their country by supporting peaceful and constitutional elections.

Urges the President of the United States to support continued economic and political reform by the new Philippine Government.