Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 11/01/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/01/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/01/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 11/01/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/01/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 11/01/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 11/01/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 11/15/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/15/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/26/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 11/26/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 01/28/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 01/28/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 01/28/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 01/28/1992
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 01/28/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/19/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/19/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/19/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/19/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/19/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/19/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/19/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 02/19/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/19/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/19/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/19/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/19/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/03/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/03/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/12/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/12/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/17/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 03/17/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/17/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/17/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/25/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/02/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/02/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/02/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/02/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/02/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/08/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/09/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/09/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/09/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/09/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/09/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/28/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/28/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/01/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/01/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/01/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/01/1992