There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution to express the sense of the Congress that Tibet, including those areas incorporated into the Chinese provinces of Sichuan, Yunnan, Gansu, and Qinghai that have historically been a part of Tibet, is an occupied country under established principles of international law whose true representatives are the Dalai Lama and the Tibetan government in exile as recognized by the Tibetan people.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/24/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
05/23/1991Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/21/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
06/11/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asian and Pacific Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/11/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/29/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/29/1991-12:56pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/24/1991SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
05/23/1991SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 92.
05/23/1991SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
05/23/1991SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/21/1991SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/21/1991 Referred to
05/23/1991 Markup by
05/23/1991 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs05/29/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asian and Pacific Affairs06/11/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations06/11/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.41. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/21/1991)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that Tibet is an occupied country under established principles of international law and that its true representatives are the Dalai Lama and the Tibetan Government in Exile.