Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 10/17/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/22/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/22/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 10/25/1991
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/25/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/29/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/30/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/04/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/19/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/21/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 01/22/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 01/29/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 01/29/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 02/06/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/07/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/18/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/18/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/25/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/25/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/26/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/27/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/27/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/27/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/27/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/03/1992
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 03/03/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/03/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/04/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/05/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/10/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/12/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/12/1992