There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution condemning the massacre of East Timorese civilians by the Indonesia military.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
11/27/1991Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate disagreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
11/23/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
11/21/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/19/1991Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell with amendments. Without written report.
11/14/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
12/02/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/27/1991SenateSenate disagreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
11/25/1991SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseA similar measure H. Con. Res. 240 was laid on the table without objection.
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H. Con. Res. 240. Agreed to without objection.
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseH.Amdt.418 On agreeing to the Hall (OH) amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseH.Amdt.418 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Hall (OH).
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
11/23/1991-5:48pmHouseMr. Hall (OH) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/23/1991-12:34pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/23/1991-10:01amHouseReceived in the House.
11/23/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/21/1991SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/21/1991SenateS.Amdt.1390 Amendment SP 1390 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
11/21/1991SenateS.Amdt.1390 Proposed by Senator Levin for Senator Pell. Condemning the Massacre of East Timorese civilians by the Indonesia military.
11/21/1991SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
11/19/1991SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 331.
11/19/1991SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell with amendments. Without written report.
11/19/1991SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
11/14/1991SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations11/14/1991 Referred to
11/19/1991 Markup by
11/19/1991 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.77. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate disagreed to House amendment (11/27/1991)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the President should reassess immediately the International Military Educational Training Program for the Indonesian Government to ensure that such program is advancing human rights; (2) an American ambassador to Indonesia should seek to visit East Timor to investigate reports of the atrocity and of additional repression by Indonesian authorities; (3) the President should request a report by the United Nations Special Rapporteur on the massacre to the General Assembly and support the introduction of a resolution in the General Assembly instructing the United Nations Commission on Human Rights to appoint a Special Rapporteur for East Timor; (4) the President should request the Indonesian Government to permit an investigation by the United Nations Special Rapporteur on Summary and Arbitrary Executions of the situation in East Timor and elsewhere in Indonesia and to establish an independent commission to investigate the cause of the atrocity and to assist the prosecution of those responsible for the massacre; and (5) the President should encourage the United Nations Secretary General and the Governments of Indonesia and Portugal and the East Timorese to arrive at an internationally acceptable solution to address the causes of conflict in East Timor.