Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/22/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/22/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/09/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/09/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/09/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/09/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/09/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 04/09/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/11/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/17/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/17/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/18/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/08/1991
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 09/25/1991
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/25/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/02/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/02/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 10/02/1991
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/02/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/02/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 10/02/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/02/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 10/02/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/02/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/02/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 10/02/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/02/1991
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/02/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/02/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/02/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/02/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/02/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 10/02/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/02/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/02/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/02/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/02/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/02/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 10/02/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 10/02/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/02/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/02/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 10/02/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/02/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/02/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/02/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/02/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/02/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/02/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/02/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/02/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/02/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/02/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/02/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/02/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 10/02/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/02/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/02/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/02/1991
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 10/02/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 10/02/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/02/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/02/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 10/02/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/02/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 10/02/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/02/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 10/02/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/02/1991