There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to designate June 15, 1991, as "Magna Carta Day".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/24/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
05/24/1991Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
05/31/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
05/29/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
05/29/1991-12:56pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/24/1991SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
05/24/1991SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/23/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/23/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/23/1991
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO]* 05/23/1991
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 05/23/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/23/1991 Referred to
05/24/1991 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service05/29/1991 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population05/31/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.150.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.150. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/23/1991)

Designates June 15, 1991, as Magna Carta Day.