There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating the week of April 21-27, 1991, as "National Crime Victims' Rights Week".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
04/24/1991Became Public Law No: 102-35.
04/24/1991Signed by President.
04/18/1991Presented to President.
04/17/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
04/17/1991Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
04/09/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
04/09/1991Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/14/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/24/1991Became Public Law No: 102-35.
04/24/1991Signed by President.
04/18/1991SenatePresented to President.
04/18/1991SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
04/17/1991-6:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/17/1991-6:23pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
04/17/1991-6:08pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
04/17/1991-6:06pmHouseMr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
04/17/1991HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
04/16/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/10/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
04/10/1991-2:30pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/10/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/09/1991SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
04/09/1991SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/14/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/28/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/28/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/28/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/05/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/05/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 03/05/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/19/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/19/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/19/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/19/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/19/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/19/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/19/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/19/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 03/19/1991
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/19/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/19/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/19/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/21/1991
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/21/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/21/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/09/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/09/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/09/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/09/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/23/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/23/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/23/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/23/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/23/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/23/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/23/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/23/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/23/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/23/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 04/23/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/23/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/23/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/23/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/23/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/23/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/23/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/23/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/23/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/23/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/23/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/23/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/23/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/23/1991
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/23/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/23/1991
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/23/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/23/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/23/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/23/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/24/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/24/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary01/14/1991 Referred to
04/09/1991 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service04/10/1991 Referred to
04/17/1991 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population04/16/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.16. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/14/1991)

Designates April 21 through April 27, 1991, as National Crime Victims' Rights Week.