There is one summary. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/12/1991)

Authorization for Use of Military Force Against Iraq Resolution - Authorizes the President to use U.S. armed forces against Iraq pursuant to United Nations Security Council Resolution 678 to implement Resolutions 660, 661, 662, 664, 665, 666, 667, 669, 670, 674, and 677 (summarized below) after making available to the Speaker of the House and the President pro tempore of the Senate his determination that: (1) the United States has used all appropriate diplomatic and other peaceful means to obtain compliance by Iraq with such resolutions; and (2) those means have not been and would not be successful.

Declares that this Act constitutes specific statutory authorization for the use of U.S. armed forces required under the War Powers Resolution.

Requires the President to report to the Congress every 60 days on the status of efforts to obtain compliance by Iraq with the U.N. resolutions.

RESOLUTION 660-AUGUST 2, 1990: Condemns Iraqi invasion of Kuwait and demands immediate and unconditional withdrawal of Iraqi forces.

RESOLUTION 661-AUGUST 6, 1990: Imposes trade embargo and financial sanctions against Iraq and Iraqi-occupied Kuwait. (Medical supplies and humanitarian foodstuffs are exempt from the trade embargo.)

RESOLUTION 662-AUGUST 9, 1990: Declares Iraq's annexation of Kuwait null and void and demands that Iraq rescind the annexation.

RESOLUTION 664-AUGUST 18, 1990: Demands that Iraq permit immediate safe departure of foreign nationals from Iraq and Kuwait. Demands rescindment of Iraq's orders to withdraw diplomatic immunity and close diplomatic missions in Kuwait.

RESOLUTION 665-AUGUST 25, 1990: Calls upon states to enforce the trade embargo against Iraq and Iraqi-occupied Kuwait.

RESOLUTION 666-SEPTEMBER 14, 1990: Provides for humanitarian provision of any necessary food and medical supplies to Iraq and Kuwait.

RESOLUTION 667-SEPTEMBER 16, 1990: Demands that Iraq protect diplomatic personnel and premises and take no action that hinders the performance of their duties.

RESOLUTION 669-SEPTEMBER 24, 1990: Authorizes Sanctions Committee to examine requests for assistance from states confronted with special economic problems related to the sanctions.

RESOLUTION 670-SEPTEMBER 25, 1990: Requires states to cooperate with air embargo and to detain any ships that are being used to violate the sanctions. (Food and medical supplies being shipped for humanitarian reasons are exempt, but subject to authorization.)

RESOLUTION 674-OCTOBER 29, 1990: Reminds Iraq that it is liable under international law for any loss, damage, or injury arising in regard to Kuwait and third states and their nationals as a result of Iraq's invasion and occupation of Kuwait.

RESOLUTION 677-NOVEMBER 28, 1990: Condemns Iraqi attempts to alter Kuwait's demographic composition and destroy Kuwaiti civil records. Mandates steps to be taken by the U.N. to safeguard the demographic composition of Kuwait.

RESOLUTION 678-NOVEMBER 29, 1990: Authorizes member states to use all means necessary to uphold the above resolutions and restore international peace and security in the region, unless Iraq fully complies with the above resolutions on or before January 15, 1991.