Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/30/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 02/05/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/07/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/07/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/19/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/19/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/19/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/19/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/19/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/19/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/19/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/19/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/19/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/19/1992
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/19/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/19/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/21/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/21/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/21/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/25/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/25/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/26/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/05/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/05/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/05/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/05/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/11/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/11/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/17/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/25/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/31/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/31/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/31/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 03/31/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/31/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/01/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/01/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/01/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/01/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/01/1992
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/09/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/10/1992