Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/19/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 11/19/1991
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 11/20/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 01/21/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 01/21/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/21/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/23/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/23/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 01/24/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/24/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 01/24/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/29/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 01/29/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/29/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 01/29/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/29/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/06/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/06/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/06/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 02/06/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/06/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/06/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/06/1992
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/19/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/19/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/19/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/19/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/19/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/19/1992
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 02/19/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/21/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/21/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/21/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/21/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/21/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/21/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/21/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 02/25/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/25/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/25/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/25/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/25/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/25/1992
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/25/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/27/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 03/10/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/10/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/10/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/10/1992