Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/23/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/23/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/23/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 01/27/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/27/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 01/27/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/27/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 01/27/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 01/28/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/28/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 01/28/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 01/28/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/28/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/28/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 01/28/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 01/28/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 01/28/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 01/28/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/28/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/28/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 01/28/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 01/28/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 01/28/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 01/28/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 01/28/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 01/28/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 01/28/1992
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 01/28/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 01/28/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 01/28/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 01/28/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 01/28/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 01/28/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 01/31/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/31/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 01/31/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/31/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 01/31/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 01/31/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 01/31/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 01/31/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/31/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/31/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 01/31/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 01/31/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/31/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/31/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 01/31/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 01/31/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 02/04/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/04/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/04/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/04/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/04/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/04/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/04/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/04/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/06/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/06/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 02/18/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/18/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/18/1992