There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating August 7, 1992, as "Battle of Guadalcanal Remembrance Day".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/25/1992Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
02/03/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/30/1992HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
06/29/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
06/29/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/29/1992-12:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/26/1992SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
06/25/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 500.
06/25/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
06/25/1992SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/03/1992SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/18/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/18/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/18/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/18/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/18/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/18/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/20/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/20/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/20/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/20/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/21/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/25/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/25/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/26/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/03/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/03/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/04/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/04/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/05/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/12/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/12/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/12/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/12/1992
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/12/1992
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/12/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/13/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/19/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/19/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/24/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/25/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/26/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/31/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/31/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/01/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/01/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/02/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/07/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/07/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/08/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/09/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/09/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/09/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/10/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/10/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/10/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/10/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/10/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/10/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/10/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/28/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 04/28/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/06/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/09/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/11/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/23/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/25/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/03/1992 Referred to
06/25/1992 Markup by
06/25/1992 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service06/29/1992 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population06/30/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.248.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.248. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/03/1992)

Designates August 7, 1992, as Battle of Guadalcanal Remembrance Day.