Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 02/18/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/18/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/18/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/18/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/18/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/18/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/20/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/20/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/20/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/20/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/21/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/25/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/25/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/26/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/03/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/03/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/04/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/04/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/05/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/12/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/12/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/12/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/12/1992
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/12/1992
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/12/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/13/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 03/19/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/19/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/24/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/25/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/26/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/31/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/31/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/01/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/01/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/02/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/07/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 04/07/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/08/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/09/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/09/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/09/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/10/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/10/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/10/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/10/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/10/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/10/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/10/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/28/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 04/28/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/06/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/09/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/11/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/23/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/25/1992