Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/26/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/26/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/26/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/26/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/26/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/31/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/31/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/31/1992
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/31/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/31/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/31/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/31/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/01/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/01/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/02/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/02/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/07/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 04/07/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 04/07/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/07/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 04/08/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 04/08/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/08/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/08/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/08/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/08/1992
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 04/08/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/09/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 04/09/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/09/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/10/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 04/10/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/28/1992
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 04/28/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/28/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/28/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/28/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/28/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/28/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/28/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/28/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/28/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/30/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/30/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/05/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/05/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/05/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/06/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/06/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 05/07/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/07/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/07/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/07/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 05/07/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 05/07/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/12/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/02/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/09/1992