Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/07/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/18/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/18/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/18/1992
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 02/18/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 02/18/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/18/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/18/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/18/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/18/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/18/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/18/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/19/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/19/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/19/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/19/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/20/1992
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/20/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/25/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/25/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/25/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/25/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/25/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/25/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/25/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/25/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/25/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/25/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/25/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 02/25/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 02/25/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 02/25/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 02/25/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/25/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 02/25/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/25/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/25/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/25/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/26/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/26/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/26/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/26/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/26/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/26/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/26/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/26/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/26/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/26/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/27/1992
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/27/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/27/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/27/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/27/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/11/1992