There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to authorize the President to proclaim the last Friday of April, 1992, as "National Arbor Day".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/26/1992Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/25/1992Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/01/1992HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/30/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/30/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/30/1992-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/26/1992SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/26/1992SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/25/1992SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/25/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/25/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/25/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/28/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/25/1992 Referred to
03/26/1992 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service03/30/1992 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population04/01/1992 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.280. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/25/1992)

Authorizes and requests the President to designate the last Friday of April 1992 as National Arbor Day.