Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 04/09/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 04/09/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 04/09/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/10/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/10/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/10/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/30/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/30/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/30/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/30/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/14/1992
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/14/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/30/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/28/1992