Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 05/13/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/13/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 05/21/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/21/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/21/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/21/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 05/21/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/21/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/21/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/21/1992
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 05/21/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/21/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/03/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/03/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/03/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/03/1992
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/03/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/03/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/03/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/03/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/03/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/03/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/03/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/03/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/03/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/03/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/03/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/03/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/11/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/17/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/17/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/23/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/24/1992