Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/27/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/27/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 07/27/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/27/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 07/27/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/15/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/15/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/15/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/15/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 09/15/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/15/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/15/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 09/15/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 09/17/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/17/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 09/17/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/17/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/17/1992
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/21/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/21/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/21/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/22/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 09/22/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/22/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/22/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/22/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/23/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 09/23/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/23/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/23/1992
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/23/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 09/23/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/23/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 09/25/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 09/25/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 09/25/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/25/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 09/29/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/29/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/02/1992