Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 08/06/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 08/06/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 08/06/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/12/1992
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 08/12/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 08/12/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 08/12/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/12/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/08/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 09/08/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 09/08/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 09/08/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/09/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/14/1992
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/14/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/15/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/15/1992
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/15/1992
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/17/1992
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/17/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/17/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/17/1992
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/17/1992
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/18/1992
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 09/18/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/18/1992
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/21/1992