There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution commemorating the 200th Anniversary of U.S.-Portuguese Diplomatic Relations.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/08/1991Became Public Law No: 102-8.
03/08/1991Signed by President.
02/28/1991Presented to President.
02/27/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 25).
02/20/1991Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/20/1991Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/30/1991Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
03/08/1991Became Public Law No: 102-8.
03/08/1991Signed by President.
02/28/1991SenatePresented to President.
02/28/1991SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
02/27/1991-3:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/27/1991-3:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 25).
02/27/1991-3:27pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
02/26/1991-12:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Feb. 27.
02/26/1991-12:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
02/26/1991-12:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
02/26/1991-12:37pmHouseMr. Hamilton moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
02/25/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
02/21/1991HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
02/21/1991HouseReferred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/21/1991-11:04amHouseReceived in the House.
02/21/1991SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/20/1991SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
02/20/1991SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/30/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/30/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/30/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/19/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/19/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/19/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/19/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/19/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/19/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/19/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/19/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/19/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/20/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/21/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/21/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/21/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/21/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/21/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/21/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/21/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/21/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/21/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/21/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/21/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/21/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/21/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/21/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/21/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/21/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/21/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/28/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/28/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/28/1991
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/28/1991

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/30/1991 Referred to
02/20/1991 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs02/21/1991 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service02/21/1991 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population02/25/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.55. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/30/1991)

Recognizes the 200th anniversary of the establishment of diplomatic relations between the United States and Portugal.

Asserts the continued friendship and cooperation between the peoples of such countries.

Authorizes and requests the President to issue a proclamation recognizing the bicentennial of United States and Portuguese diplomatic relations.