Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/30/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/30/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 02/19/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/19/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/19/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/19/1991
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/19/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/19/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/19/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/19/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/19/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/19/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/19/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/20/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/21/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/21/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/21/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/21/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/21/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/21/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/21/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/21/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/21/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/21/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/21/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/21/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/21/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/21/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/21/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 02/21/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/21/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/28/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/28/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/28/1991
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 02/28/1991