Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/20/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/21/1991
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/21/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/21/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/21/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/21/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/21/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/21/1991
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/21/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/21/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/21/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/21/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/21/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/22/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/22/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/22/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/22/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/22/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/22/1991
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 03/22/1991
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/22/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/22/1991
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/22/1991
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/22/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/22/1991
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/22/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/22/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/1991
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/22/1991
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/22/1991
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/22/1991
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 04/09/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/09/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/09/1991
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/09/1991
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/09/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 04/09/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/09/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/09/1991
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/09/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/09/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/09/1991
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/09/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/09/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/09/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 04/09/1991
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/09/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 04/16/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/16/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/17/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/17/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/17/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/17/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/17/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/24/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/24/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/24/1991