Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/23/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/23/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/23/1992
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/23/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/23/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/23/1992
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/23/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/23/1992
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/24/1992
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/24/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/24/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/28/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/28/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 08/03/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 08/03/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 08/05/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 08/05/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 08/10/1992
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 08/12/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 08/12/1992