Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/05/1991
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/06/1991
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/12/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/12/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/12/1991
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/12/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/12/1991
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/12/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/12/1991
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/12/1991
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/12/1991
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 03/12/1991
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/13/1991
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/13/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/13/1991
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/13/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/20/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/20/1991
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/20/1991
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/09/1991
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/09/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/09/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/09/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 05/06/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/06/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/17/1991
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/18/1991